AZ SB1367 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Assyrian genocide; monument; procedures
Title
Assyrian genocide; monument; procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Rep. Andrea Dalessandro [D] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Martin Quezada [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Governor Vetoed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-17-6-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |