AZ SB1362 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Mobile home, RV parks; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile home, RV parks; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17 Chapter 315
2016-05-17 Governor Signed
2016-05-09 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-07HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-05-07HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0)
2016-03-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-03-01HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-09HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2016-03-02HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2016-03-02HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-01HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2016-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-22SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2016-02-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-08SenateSenate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2016-02-01SenateReferred to Senate CWD Committee
2016-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate CWD Committee
2016-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1362
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1362p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1362s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0315.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.1362ky.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.1362cwd.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/1362griffin1008.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1362.scwd.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1362.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1362.hcom.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1362.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1362.hthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback