AZ SB1360 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 338
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dependency proceedings; permanent guardianships; reunification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependency proceedings; permanent guardianships; reunification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 338
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-09HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (49-6-5-0)
2017-04-27HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-27SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-0-3-0)
2017-04-27SenateSenate Conference adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Conference adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2017-04-25SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2017-04-20SenateSenate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments and the bill be further amended.
2017-04-20HouseHouse Conference members: COBB, ALLEN J, RIOS
2017-04-20HouseHouse Conference appointed
2017-04-20SenateSenate Conference members: BROPHY MCGEE, BARTO, QUEZADA
2017-04-20SenateSenate Conference appointed
2017-04-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-20SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-1-0)
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-09HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411292New CodeSee Bill Text
8530.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8846Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8871Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8873Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8873.01New CodeSee Bill Text
8874Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69188
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1360p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1360s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1360h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1360c.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0338.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1360carter2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1360health.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/53leg/1r/s.13600944.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69188&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69188&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69188&billStatusActionId=175216&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69188&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69188&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69188&billStatusActionId=176861&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69188&billStatusActionId=177025&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69188&billStatusActionId=177297&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69188&billStatusActionId=177557&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback