AZ SB1359 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motorcycle safety fund; advisory council
Title
Motorcycle safety fund; advisory council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |