AZ SB1358 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hand counts; precincts; procedures manual
Title
Hand counts; precincts; procedures manual
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Wendy Rogers [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. John Fillmore [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |