AZ SB1356 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water bank; excess CAP water
Title
Water bank; excess CAP water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (55-0-5-0) | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-13 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | House WE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House WE Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House WE Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-4-1-0) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:39 PM | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |