AZ SB1354 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public retirement systems; prefunding plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public retirement systems; prefunding plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26 Transmitted to Governor
2020-05-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-05-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-5-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-03-16HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-12HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2020-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0)
2020-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-12SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2020-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35314.04New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73627
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1354p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1354s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1354livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1354fin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73627&billStatusActionId=193706&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73627&billStatusActionId=193751&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73627&billStatusActionId=196334&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73627&billStatusActionId=196343&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback