AZ SB1352 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax roll; corrections
Title
Property tax roll; corrections
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. John McComish [R] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 249 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |