AZ SB1348 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

ASRS; supplemental employee deferral plans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ASRS; supplemental employee deferral plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateChapter 310
2021-05-03SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-04-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-17HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-02HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2021-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38781Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75366
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1348p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1348s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0310.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483347
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487070
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487311
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489155
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489214
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75366&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75366&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75366&billStatusActionId=201172&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75366&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75366&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75366&billStatusActionId=203849&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback