AZ SB1346 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State employees; vaccination inquiries prohibited
Title
State employees; vaccination inquiries prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP ON RECON) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP ON RECON) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 354 |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee action: Do pass on reconsideration, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House GE Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-7-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Prohibited
State Agencies
State Employees
State Government - Title 41
Vaccination Inquiries
Vaccinations (h)
State Agencies
State Employees
State Government - Title 41
Vaccination Inquiries
Vaccinations (h)