AZ SB1339 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-3-1-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Kratom products; enforcement; financial institutions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kratom products; enforcement; financial institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-3-1-1-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-1-0)
2021-01-26SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-25SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36795Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36795.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36795.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36795.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36795.04New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75355
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1339p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1339s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.13390855.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1339hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.1339payne.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.1339military affairs public safety.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483558
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484184
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486942
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487765
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75355&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75355&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75355&billStatusActionId=201137&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75355&billStatusActionId=201385&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75355&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback