AZ SB1337 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial hemp; licensing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22 Governor Vetoed
2017-05-10 Transmitted to Governor
2017-05-10SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-05-10SenateSenate concurs
2017-05-10SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-05-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-05-09SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-2-5-0)
2017-05-09HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-29HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-16HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-14SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2017-02-13SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411758.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41619.51Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69159
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1337p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1337s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1337h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1337borrelli.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1337comps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1337borrelli0341.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1337barton3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1337land agriculture and rural affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69159&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69159&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69159&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69159&billStatusActionId=175583&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69159&billStatusActionId=175417&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69159&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69159&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69159&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#5
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69159&billStatusActionId=177480&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69159&billStatusActionId=177537&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69159&billStatusActionId=177561&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69159&billStatusActionId=177597&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69159&billStatusActionId=177600&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback