AZ SB1335 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (14-0-1-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Deputy constable appointments; website notification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deputy constable appointments; website notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (14-0-1-0-0-0)
2023-03-27HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-23HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2023-03-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2023-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2023-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-08SenateSenate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2023-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate MAPS Committee
2023-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78988
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1335p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1335s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.1335LIVINGSTON.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.1335LIVINGSTON SE.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.1335APPROPRIATIONS.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503400
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507426
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507547
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507841
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508387
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78988&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78988&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78988&billStatusActionId=215801&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78988&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback