AZ SB1335 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Tourism marketing authorities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism marketing authorities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-05-19HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0-0-0)
2020-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2020-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-05HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0)
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-19SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-2-0)
2020-02-11SenateSenate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2020-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2020-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73598
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1335p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1335s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1335mesnard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1335fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1335pace0507.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73598&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73598&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73598&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73598&billStatusActionId=195213&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73598&billStatusActionId=195355&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73598&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73598&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4

Bill Comments

feedback