AZ SB1334 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DUI; license suspensions; restrictions
Title
DUI; license suspensions; restrictions
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Chapter 233 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-05-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-6-4-0) |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |