AZ SB1333 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood occupantless electric vehicles
Title
Neighborhood occupantless electric vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Chapter 256 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (21-4-5-0) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-2-10-0) |
2022-05-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 663 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 664 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 665 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 666 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |