AZ SB1332 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Alternative fuel vehicles; VLT

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative fuel vehicles; VLT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-1-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-25HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
285805Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71958
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1332p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1332s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.13320347.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1332tps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1332rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71958&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71958&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71958&billStatusActionId=186649&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71958&billStatusActionId=186806&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71958&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71958&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback