AZ SB1332 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lobbying; disclosures; reporting
Title
Lobbying; disclosures; reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Sen. Rich Crandall [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Jack Jackson [D] | Sen. John McComish [R] |
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |