AZ SB1332 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public agencies; elected officials; communications
Title
Public agencies; elected officials; communications
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |