AZ SB1330 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - House RULES Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - House RULES Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited activities; second amendment violations
Title
Prohibited activities; second amendment violations
Sponsors
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: Held |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-0-0) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |