AZ SB1324 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2560
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Images; voter lists; records; penalties
Title
Images; voter lists; records; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Motion Senator Borrelli moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return Senate Bill 1324, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representative on March 28, 2023 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Motion Senator Borrelli moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return Senate Bill 1324, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representative on March 28, 2023 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Motion Senator Borrelli moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return Senate Bill 1324, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representative on March 28, 2023 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Motion Senator Borrelli moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return Senate Bill 1324, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representative on March 28, 2023 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Borrelli moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return Senate Bill 1324, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representative on March 28, 2023 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. May 9, 2023 the House returned SB 1324. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2560 (Replaced by) 2023-05-19 - Governor Vetoed
Subjects
Ballot Images
Ballot Storage
Cast Vote Record
Classification
Conduct Of Elections
Contest
Definitions
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Portal
Filing
Images
Penalties
Records
Statement Of Contest
Verification
Violation
Voter Lists
Ballot Storage
Cast Vote Record
Classification
Conduct Of Elections
Contest
Definitions
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Portal
Filing
Images
Penalties
Records
Statement Of Contest
Verification
Violation
Voter Lists
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 407.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |