AZ SB1323 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Kinship foster care; TANF benefits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kinship foster care; TANF benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-13HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-02-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-04SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2020-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8514.03Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback