AZ SB1319 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Influenza vaccinations; committee reference review
Title
Influenza vaccinations; committee reference review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-5-1-0) |
2017-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |