AZ SB1318 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; training; screening; dyslexia
Title
Schools; training; screening; dyslexia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 198 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-1) |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | House | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 501.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |