AZ SB1318 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; dyslexia; screening; training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; dyslexia; screening; training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-12SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15249.14New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback