AZ SB1318 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abortion; health care exchange; licensure
Title
Abortion; health care exchange; licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Chapter 87 | |
2015-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-3-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2015-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |