AZ SB1315 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incompetent and dangerous defendants; treatment
Title
Incompetent and dangerous defendants; treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Victoria Steele [D] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |