AZ SB1312 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; special license plates; design.
Title
Veterans; special license plates; design.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 215 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-18-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Auxiliary Special Plates
Design
Fund
Highway User Revenue Fund (h)
Special License Plates
Special Plate Fund
Special Plates
State Highway Fund (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Veterans
Veterans Of Overseas Conflicts
Design
Fund
Highway User Revenue Fund (h)
Special License Plates
Special Plate Fund
Special Plates
State Highway Fund (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Veterans
Veterans Of Overseas Conflicts
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2469 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |