AZ SB1307 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; presidential elector deadlines

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; presidential elector deadlines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateChapter 262
2017-05-02SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0)
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-09HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2017-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16344Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69106
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1307p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1307s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0262.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1307rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1307kavanagh0756.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69106&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69106&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69106&billStatusActionId=175579&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69106&billStatusActionId=175427&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69106&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69106&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69106&billStatusActionId=177193&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback