AZ SB1306 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship foster care; TANF monies
Title
Kinship foster care; TANF monies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Child Safety - Title 8
Child Welfare And Placement
Kinship Foster Care
Repeal
Tanf
Tanf Monies
Child Safety - Title 8
Child Welfare And Placement
Kinship Foster Care
Repeal
Tanf
Tanf Monies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 514.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 514.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |