AZ SB1304 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - House read second time
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Home arrest; electronic monitoring

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home arrest; electronic monitoring

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-30HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-2-0-0-0)
2023-03-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-29HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2023-03-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-28HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0)
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-16SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2023-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411604.21New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78955
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1304p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1304s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/S.1304KERN.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/S.1304JUD.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504285
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504755
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507683
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507585
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507878
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508564
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78955&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78955&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78955&billStatusActionId=218166&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78955&billStatusActionId=218172&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78955&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback