AZ SB1304 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Charter schools; state board; continuation.
Title
Charter schools; state board; continuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |