AZ SB1302 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - House read second time
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
CTEDs; average daily membership.
Title
CTEDs; average daily membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Average Daily Membership
Campus
Career Technical Education Districts
Cteds
Education - Title 15
Legislative Findings
Legislative Intent
Campus
Career Technical Education Districts
Cteds
Education - Title 15
Legislative Findings
Legislative Intent
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 341.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |