AZ SB1300 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Game and fish department; continuation
Title
Game and fish department; continuation
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | Senate final reading , voting: (24-6-0-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-22 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | House ENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to House ENR Committee | |
2012-03-06 | House read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House ENR Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |