AZ SB1299 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State warrants; substitute checks
Title
State warrants; substitute checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chapter 61 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 185.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 185.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 186 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 327 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 426 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 430 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |