AZ SB1296 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Government communications; emergency response interpreters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government communications; emergency response interpreters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateChapter 339
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0)
2018-05-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-05-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0-0)
2018-03-22HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-19HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-15HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-14HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11269.20New CodeSee Bill Text
415202New CodeSee Bill Text
9500.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70420
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1296p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1296s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0339.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1296bowie0900.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70420&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70420&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70420&billStatusActionId=182480&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70420&billStatusActionId=182491&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70420&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70420&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70420&billStatusActionId=183743&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70420&billStatusActionId=183766&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback