AZ SB1293 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; EORP contributions; counties.
Title
Appropriations; EORP contributions; counties.
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-3-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriations
Counties
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Eorp Contributions
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Counties
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Eorp Contributions
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38