AZ SB1293 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

GIITEM subaccount; predictive policing technology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GIITEM subaccount; predictive policing technology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13 Governor Vetoed
2015-04-02 Transmitted to Governor
2015-04-02SenateSenate final reading , voting: (17-13-0-0)
2015-04-02SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2015-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-04-01HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-04-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0)
2015-03-31HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2015-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2015-03-09HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-25HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-1-0-0-0)
2015-03-12HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2015-03-12HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn
2015-03-10HouseReferred to House MAPS Committee
2015-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2015-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-03-12HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2015-03-09HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2015-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2015-03-05SenateTransmit to House
2015-03-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0)
2015-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-02-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-01-29SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-02-17SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2015-01-29SenateReferred to Senate APPROP Committee
2015-02-04SenateSenate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0)
2015-02-02SenateReferred to Senate PSMT Committee
2015-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2015-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2015-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate PSMT Committee
2015-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=114&Bill_Number=SB1293
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/s.12931017.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/s.1293psmt.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/1293smith1115.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/proposed/h.1293ds1.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/adopted/h.1293-approp.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293.spsmt.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293.sapprop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293.happrop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/1r/bills/sb1293.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback