AZ SB1292 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

EORP; cost-of-living adjustment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EORP; cost-of-living adjustment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse BI Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38818Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
38818.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
38818.02Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
38818.03Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
38818.04New CodeSee Bill Text
38819Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70411
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1292p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1292s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.12921027.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1292fin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70411&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70411&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70411&billStatusActionId=180661&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70411&billStatusActionId=180875&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70411&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback