AZ SB1292 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Arizona competes fund; microenterprises

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arizona competes fund; microenterprises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 336
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-10SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-1-1-0)
2017-05-10SenateSenate concurs
2017-05-10SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-05-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-05-09SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-14-5-0)
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-08HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-08HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-28HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-06SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2017-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411545.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411545.05Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69085
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1292p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1292s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1292h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0336.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1292comps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.12920135.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.12920415.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.12920306.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1292rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1292farnsworth d0350.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69085&billStatusActionId=175578&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69085&billStatusActionId=175415&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69085&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69085&billStatusActionId=177534&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69085&billStatusActionId=177562&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69085&billStatusActionId=177596&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69085&billStatusActionId=177598&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback