AZ SB1290 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Martinez, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1290. Passed by vv.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Martinez, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1290. Passed by vv.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ADOT; report; construction projects; bidders
Title
ADOT; report; construction projects; bidders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Martinez, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1290. Passed by vv.
(Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1290 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1290 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Martinez, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1290. Passed by vv. |
2024-04-04 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-04-04 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-26 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-03-26 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-27-4-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-2-0-0) |
2024-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Bidders
Construction Project Contracts
Construction Projects
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Lowest Qualified Bidders
Lowest Responsible Bidder
Quarterly Report
Report
Transportation - Title 28
Bidders
Construction Project Contracts
Construction Projects
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Lowest Qualified Bidders
Lowest Responsible Bidder
Quarterly Report
Report
Transportation - Title 28