AZ SB1288 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Registration; use tax; license tabs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration; use tax; license tabs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-21HouseHouse WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-1-0-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-08HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70403
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1288p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1288s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1288ugenti-rita se.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1288ugenti-rita se2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1288ways and means.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70403&billStatusActionId=180544&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70403&billStatusActionId=183351&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback