AZ SB1288 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Homeowners' associations; board conflicts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' associations; board conflicts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2017-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331811Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback