AZ SB1287 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

ADOT revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADOT revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateChapter 166
2018-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-3-0)
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-21HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-22HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-21HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282158Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28364Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28442Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28448Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70402
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1287p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1287s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0166.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.12870901.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1287transit.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70402&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70402&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70402&billStatusActionId=181380&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70402&billStatusActionId=181394&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70402&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70402&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70402&billStatusActionId=182900&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback