AZ SB1286 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic survival schools; updated curriculum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic survival schools; updated curriculum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
283412Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback