AZ SB1285 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Construction contracts; public works; payments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction contracts; public works; payments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-03-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2019-03-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-12HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-11SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286924.01New CodeSee Bill Text
286924.02New CodeSee Bill Text
286926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34221.01New CodeSee Bill Text
34221.02New CodeSee Bill Text
34227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34609.01New CodeSee Bill Text
34609.02New CodeSee Bill Text
34609.03New CodeSee Bill Text
412501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412576Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412577Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412577.01New CodeSee Bill Text
412577.02New CodeSee Bill Text
412583Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71897
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1285p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1285s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1285floorborrelli.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1285weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1285commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71897&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71897&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71897&billStatusActionId=186782&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71897&billStatusActionId=187215&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71897&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71897&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71897&billStatusActionId=188620&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71897&billStatusActionId=188771&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback