AZ SB1277 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle rightofway; buses
Title
Vehicle rightofway; buses
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Sen. John McComish [R] | Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Victoria Steele [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |