AZ SB1276 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Assessed valuation; class one property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assessed valuation; class one property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-08 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-08HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-1-0-0)
2023-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-02-27HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2023-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-02-16HouseTransmit to House
2023-02-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2023-02-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-06SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4213054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4215001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78909
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1276p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1276s.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502908
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504884
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504939
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506031
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506423
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78909&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78909&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78909&billStatusActionId=215744&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78909&billStatusActionId=215758&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78909&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback