AZ SB1273 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
STOs; contributions; allowable uses
Title
STOs; contributions; allowable uses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Allowable Uses
Career And Technical Education
Certification (h)
Contributions
Corporate Donations (h)
Definitions
Educational Scholarship
Educational Testing Organization
Extracurricular Activities
Industry Certification Assessment
School Tuition Organization Scholarships
Standardized Testing For College Credit Or Readiness
Sto
Students With Disabilities (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tuition Grants
Career And Technical Education
Certification (h)
Contributions
Corporate Donations (h)
Definitions
Educational Scholarship
Educational Testing Organization
Extracurricular Activities
Industry Certification Assessment
School Tuition Organization Scholarships
Standardized Testing For College Credit Or Readiness
Sto
Students With Disabilities (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tuition Grants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |