AZ SB1271 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - House LARA Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - House LARA Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hemp-derived products; regulation
Title
Hemp-derived products; regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | House LARA Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Affirmative Defense
Agriculture - Title 3
Applications
Authorization
Corrective Actions
Definitions
Exemption From Rulemaking
Fees
Fingerprinting Requirement
Hearing
Hemp-derived
Hemp-derived Products
Industrial Hemp
Industrial Hemp Licenses
Inspection
Intent
Legislative Findings
Purpose
Recordkeeping
Regulation
Renewal
Revocation
Rulemaking
Transportation And Distribution Requirements
Agriculture - Title 3
Applications
Authorization
Corrective Actions
Definitions
Exemption From Rulemaking
Fees
Fingerprinting Requirement
Hearing
Hemp-derived
Hemp-derived Products
Industrial Hemp
Industrial Hemp Licenses
Inspection
Intent
Legislative Findings
Purpose
Recordkeeping
Regulation
Renewal
Revocation
Rulemaking
Transportation And Distribution Requirements
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 313. | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |